05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 547 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6576 | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 335 | |||
04/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 213 | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |