04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/07/2011 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 135 | |||
03/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 124 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |