|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-180
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 602
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6988
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
File Number 811
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/17/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
File Number 640
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 398
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|