04/18/2011 | File Number 569 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 355 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/01/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |