07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/22/2011 | Public Act 11-118 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 517 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/05/2011 | File Number 371 | |||
04/05/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 238 | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |