04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 424 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 254 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |