05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 518 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/05/2011 | File Number 372 | |||
04/05/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | |||
04/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |