|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 603
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6286
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
File Number 336
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 223
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|