|
06/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Public Act 11-49
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
House Calendar Number 519
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
File Number 450
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 287
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|