05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 563 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6698 | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6310 | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 224 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 168 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/14/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |