|
05/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6749
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6639
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 209
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 156
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|