|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-72
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Calendar Number 554
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Reconsidered
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6627
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6188
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
File Number 225
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 162
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|