05/19/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/19/2011 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
05/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/19/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/19/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/18/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on General Law | |||
05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 520 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6175 | |||
03/30/2011 | File Number 296 | |||
03/30/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 191 | |||
03/30/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |