07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-169 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 565 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/05/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 226 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 166 | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |