04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 227 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 167 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/16/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |