06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Program Review and Investigations | |||
04/27/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 570 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |