05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 521 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6072 | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 210 | |||
03/24/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 155 | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |