03/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/16/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Housing | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Housing | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |