05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-9 | |||
05/11/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/11/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 405 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 264 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 188 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/14/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |