05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 566 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6617 | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6601 | |||
04/27/2011 | File Number 641 | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 400 | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/13/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |