07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/17/2011 | Public Act 11-73 | |||
06/07/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/07/2011 | House Passed | |||
06/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 632 | |||
06/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/06/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/19/2011 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
05/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
04/27/2011 | File Number 642 | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |