|
06/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Public Act 11-47
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
House Calendar Number 522
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6217
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
File Number 265
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 189
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|