|
05/19/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 482
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5565
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
File Number 426
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 240
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|