|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-181
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 604
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7915
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
File Number 840
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
File Number 507
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 293
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|