06/06/2011 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8290 | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/27/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 509 | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 295 | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/03/2011 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |