|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 622
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8268
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6462
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
File Number 606
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 374
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|