|
06/01/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
House Calendar Number 550
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6738
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
File Number 455
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 273
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|