05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 457 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 277 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/03/2011 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |