|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Public Act 11-233
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Calendar Number 640
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8717
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8702
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 750
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 462
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Public Hearing 04/11
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|