06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |||
04/27/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/12/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 311 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 198 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |