06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 428 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 245 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |