06/08/2011 | House Calendar Number 636 | |||
06/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/07/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 730 | |||
05/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 449 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/21/2011 | Public Hearing 03/25 | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |