05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 523 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 430 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 248 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |