07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Special Act 11-13 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/24/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/24/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
05/24/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/18/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 524 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 340 | |||
04/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |