|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 571
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 356
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|