06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-30 | |||
05/18/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/18/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 504 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/19/2011 | File Number 578 | |||
04/19/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 360 | |||
04/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |