05/26/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/26/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/26/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/25/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/11/2011 | File Number 798 | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 494 | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |