05/12/2011 | No New File by Committee on Education | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/12/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/12/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 694 | |||
05/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 431 | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/30 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |