05/24/2011 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
05/24/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 732 | |||
05/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 447 | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/21/2011 | Public Hearing 03/25 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |