04/06/2011 | File Number 431 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 246 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |