05/26/2011 | File Number 846 | |||
05/26/2011 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/26/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/26/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/25/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/16/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 462 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 266 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |