05/31/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
05/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/31/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/31/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/26/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 463 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 267 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |