07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-218 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 549 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 433 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 242 | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |