07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-219 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
06/08/2011 | Rules Suspended | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
04/26/2011 | File Number 627 | |||
04/26/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | |||
04/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/30 | |||
03/15/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |