|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Special Act 11-17
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Calendar Number 641
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8708
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
File Number 806
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/16/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 576
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 358
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/23
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|