06/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 606 | |||
06/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7824 | |||
05/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/27/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/26/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 696 | |||
05/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 433 | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |