05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 525 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 667 | |||
04/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 407 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/04/2011 | Public Hearing 04/08 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |