04/25/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/19/2011 | File Number 579 | |||
04/19/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 361 | |||
04/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/23/2011 | Public Hearing 03/28 | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |