05/18/2011 | File Number 812 | |||
05/18/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/17/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/26/2011 | File Number 633 | |||
04/26/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 391 | |||
04/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/30 | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |