06/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 610 | |||
06/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/02/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/04/2011 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
05/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/21/2011 | File Number 615 | |||
04/21/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 382 | |||
04/15/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |